TN HB2306 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Joe Clyde Daniels Act" to require the board of parole, in making a parole determination for an offender convicted of a homicide, to consider whether the offender obstructed or continues to obstruct the ability of law enforcement to recover the remains of the victim. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, relative to parole determinations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 944 | |
2022-04-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-12 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 3 |
2022-04-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2223 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 944