TN HB2303 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1031
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1031
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a county to pay to an employee up to 15 percent of the total premium that would have otherwise been paid by the county on behalf of the employee who opts out of the coverage provided by the county. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 27.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 27, relative to insurance for county employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Michael Curcio [R] |
Rep. Rusty Grills [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1031 | |
2022-04-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/13/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2294 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-25 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022