TN HB2303 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 810
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 810
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, classifies knowingly damaging farm equipment by means of fire or explosion as arson, a Class C felony. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, classifies knowingly damaging farm equipment by means of fire or explosion as arson, a Class C felony. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 810 | |
2020-06-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-26 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2884 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 810