TN HB2303 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Health Care Provider Stability Act". - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Health Care Provider Stability Act". - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) INSURANCE AND BANKING COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Insurance and Banking Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Insurance and Banking Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2014-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-03 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2427 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-09 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.