TN HB2301 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Requested S. to return.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, declares settlement agreement provisions that have purpose or effect of concealing details relating to claim of sexual harassment or sexual assault as void and unenforceable and contrary to public policy of this state if settlement agreement is entered into by governmental entity; maintains confidentiality of victim's identity. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 3; Title 10; Title 20 and Title 29.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, declares settlement agreement provisions that have purpose or effect of concealing details relating to claim of sexual harassment or sexual assault as void and unenforceable and contrary to public policy of this state if settlement agreement is entered into by governmental entity; maintains confidentiality of victim's identity. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 3; Title 10; Title 20 and Title 29.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25HouseRequested S. to return.
2018-04-25SenateRe-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
2018-04-25SenateMotion to reconsider adopted.
2018-04-25SenateTabling motion lifted
2018-04-25HouseH. returned.
2018-04-25SenateRecalled from House
2018-04-24SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2018-04-24SenateSenate Amendment #2 withdrawn.
2018-04-24SenateSenate reconsidered action in adopting Senate Am. #2
2018-04-24SenateMotion to reconsider adopted.
2018-04-24SenateTabling motion lifted
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar 2 calendar for 4/24/2018
2018-04-23HouseH. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 2 HB2301
2018-04-19HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/23/2018
2018-04-19SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0
2018-04-19SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA1117)
2018-04-19SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA1111)
2018-04-19SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2018-04-16SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2018-04-12HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-04-12HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-04-12HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1052)
2018-04-12HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-10HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018
2018-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018
2018-03-27HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-03-21HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/27/2018
2018-03-20HouseAction def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/27/2018
2018-03-19HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-14HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/20/2018
2018-03-14HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-14HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
2018-03-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/14/2018
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
2018-02-12HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2018-02-05HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2018-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-31HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2132 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-19 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback