TN HB2300 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires any county using direct recording electronic voting systems to have the capability to create a voter-verifiable paper audit trail for each ballot cast. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 9.
Title
As introduced, requires any county using direct recording electronic voting systems to have the capability to create a voter-verifiable paper audit trail for each ballot cast. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to the Election Calendar |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2090 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee