TN HB2298 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from February 1 to January 15 the date by which the Tennessee bureau of investigation is required to provide an annual report to the judiciary committees of the senate and house of representatives on the amount of money collected from gun dealers to perform background checks that are in excess of the costs to the bureau to perform the checks. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49; Section 50-3-201; Section 58-1-112; Section 70-4-123 and Section 70-5-101.
Title
As introduced, changes from February 1 to January 15 the date by which the Tennessee bureau of investigation is required to provide an annual report to the judiciary committees of the senate and house of representatives on the amount of money collected from gun dealers to perform background checks that are in excess of the costs to the bureau to perform the checks. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49; Section 50-3-201; Section 58-1-112; Section 70-4-123 and Section 70-5-101.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-02 - House - HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Education Committee (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Education Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2020-03-09 | House | Ref. to Judiciary Committee-- Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2887 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020