TN HB2298 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes requirement for county election commissions to publish notice of a supplemental registration; requires county election commissions to compile a list of the supplemental registrations conducted each year and submit the list to the secretary of state by February 1 each year. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, removes requirement for county election commissions to publish notice of a supplemental registration; requires county election commissions to compile a list of the supplemental registrations conducted each year and submit the list to the secretary of state by February 1 each year. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2310 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee