TN HB2296 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Failed in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Failed in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes local governments to take special censuses that include unborn children; requires that any state funds distributed and allocated to local governments based on population use such special census figures. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 16; Title 54; Title 57 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, authorizes local governments to take special censuses that include unborn children; requires that any state funds distributed and allocated to local governments based on population use such special census figures. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 16; Title 54; Title 57 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Failed in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2069 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee