TN HB2294 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 604
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 604
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows a municipal legislative body to authorize, by ordinance passed by 2/3 vote, a member of the body who is deployed for 13 months or less while serving as a member to attend and vote in sessions through the use of two-way electronic audio-video communication during the deployment. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 8.
Title
As enacted, allows a municipal legislative body to authorize, by ordinance passed by 2/3 vote, a member of the body who is deployed for 13 months or less while serving as a member to attend and vote in sessions through the use of two-way electronic audio-video communication during the deployment. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 8.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Pub. Ch. 604 | |
2018-04-04 | Effective date(s) 03/23/2018 | |
2018-03-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-03-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-09 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0598) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-06 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-05 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0688) |
2018-03-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/5/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/13/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1959 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 604