TN HB2287 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 879
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 879
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a guide sign to be erected on or along an interstate highway or at an interchange for an exposition center located within a county agricultural center. - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 54, Chapter 5, relative to guide signs for exposition centers and other similar attractions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 879 | |
2022-03-28 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/28/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2227 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022