TN HB2281 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Taken off notice for cal. in Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Taken off notice for cal. in Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires private health insurance providers to exclude from the calculation of costs for any episode of care related to pain relief the costs for any pain relief services that reduce the use of opioids; permits the private health insurance provider to demonstrate that the alternative pain relief service is routinely used by healthcare providers in the pain relief episode of care. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires private health insurance providers to exclude from the calculation of costs for any episode of care related to pain relief the costs for any pain relief services that reduce the use of opioids; permits the private health insurance provider to demonstrate that the alternative pain relief service is routinely used by healthcare providers in the pain relief episode of care. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Hill [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
Rep. Timothy Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Insurance Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 6/1/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee |
2020-02-12 | House | Ref. to Insurance Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2838 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee