TN HB2280 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-11 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-11 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an agent or officer of the Tennessee bureau of investigation, in addition to a law enforcement officer, to provide a minor with the Tennessee human trafficking resource center hotline and release the minor to a parent's or guardian's custody or transport the minor to a shelter when the minor is taken into custody for suspicion of committing the offense of prostitution. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires an agent or officer of the Tennessee bureau of investigation, in addition to a law enforcement officer, to provide a minor with the Tennessee human trafficking resource center hotline and release the minor to a parent's or guardian's custody or transport the minor to a shelter when the minor is taken into custody for suspicion of committing the offense of prostitution. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-06-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-06-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-03-09 | House | Ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2275 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee