TN HB2278 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 822
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, shifts from December 31 each year to May 1 in 2018 and to November 1 in 2019 and years thereafter the date by which the holder of abandoned property must file a report with the treasurer regarding the property. - Amends TCA Section 66-29-125.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, shifts from December 31 each year to May 1 in 2018 and to November 1 in 2019 and years thereafter the date by which the holder of abandoned property must file a report with the treasurer regarding the property. - Amends TCA Section 66-29-125.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04 Pub. Ch. 822
2018-05-04 Effective date(s) 04/24/2018
2018-04-24 Signed by Governor.
2018-04-17HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2018-04-16SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-12HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-11HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2018-04-11SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2018-04-11SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2018-04-11SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2018-04-05HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-04-05HousePassed H., Ayes 85, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-03-29HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2018
2018-03-28HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018
2018-03-27HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-03-21HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018
2018-03-21HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-02-28HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-02-21HousePlaced on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 2/28/2018
2018-02-20HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
2018-02-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/20/2018
2018-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
2018-02-05HouseP2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
2018-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-31HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1859 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 822

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback