TN HB2275 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, deletes the offense of impersonation of a licensed professional. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, deletes the offense of impersonation of a licensed professional. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 3.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-17SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2020-06-16HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2020-06-16HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 2, PNV 0
2020-06-16HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0939)
2020-06-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/15/2020
2020-06-11HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020
2020-06-11HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-06-03HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020
2020-06-02HouseAction def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020
2020-05-27HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020
2020-05-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee
2020-05-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
2020-02-10HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2020-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2020-02-05HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-02-03HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2749 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback