TN HB2275 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates sports facilities at MTSU and TSU as "sports authority facility" for purposes of sales of alcoholic beverages and beer for consumption on the premises; specifies that ban on selling wine on Christmas, Thanksgiving, and Easter applies to retail food store wine licensees in addition to package stores. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As enacted, designates sports facilities at MTSU and TSU as "sports authority facility" for purposes of sales of alcoholic beverages and beer for consumption on the premises; specifies that ban on selling wine on Christmas, Thanksgiving, and Easter applies to retail food store wine licensees in addition to package stores. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Staples [D] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. JoAnne Favors [D] | Rep. Harold Love [D] |
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] |
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1010 | |
2018-04-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-23 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-18 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2111 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1010