TN HB2271 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 982
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 982
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the offenses for which certain items may be seized utilizing criminal asset forfeiture; revises provision regarding disposition of forfeited property. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 16; Title 17; Title 19; Title 20; Title 29; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 16; Title 17; Title 19; Title 20; Title 29; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to the administration of justice.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 982 | |
2022-04-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2022 |
2022-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2682 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022