TN HB2269 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, makes various changes to state law to reflect the change in federal law that raised the minimum age to purchase tobacco products from 18 years of age to 21 years of age. - Amends TCA Section 1-3-113; Title 39, Chapter 15 and Title 39, Chapter 17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, makes various changes to state law to reflect the change in federal law that raised the minimum age to purchase tobacco products from 18 years of age to 21 years of age. - Amends TCA Section 1-3-113; Title 39, Chapter 15 and Title 39, Chapter 17.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 732
2020-06-02HouseComp. SB subst.
2020-05-05HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2020
2020-03-20HouseReset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20
2020-03-18HouseReset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-20
2020-03-16HouseReset on cal. for 3/19/2020
2020-03-12HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020
2020-03-11HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020
2020-03-10HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-03-04HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/10/2020
2020-03-03HouseReset on Health Committee cal. for 3/10/20
2020-02-26HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/3/2020
2020-02-25HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2020-02-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 2/25/2020
2020-02-10HouseAssigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
2020-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2020-02-05HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-02-03HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2202 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 732

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback