TN HB2268 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 997
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 997
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the community cemetery grant fund; provisions to be repealed July 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 46.
Title
As enacted, creates the community cemetery grant fund; provisions to be repealed July 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 46.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 997 | |
2016-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-19 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/15/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2488 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 997
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2268&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB2268.pdf |