TN HB2266 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 707
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 707
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes the duty of the governor to proclaim days of special observance, such as Mother's Day, Harriet Tubman Day, and Volunteer Firefighters week; removes the governor's duty to invite the people of the state to observe certain days of special observance such as Andrew Jackson Day. - Amends TCA Title 15, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, removes the duty of the governor to proclaim days of special observance, such as Mother's Day, Harriet Tubman Day, and Volunteer Firefighters week; removes the governor's duty to invite the people of the state to observe certain days of special observance such as Andrew Jackson Day. - Amends TCA Title 15, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Rick Staples [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Table Amend# 2 by Gilmore (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Table Amend# 2 by Gilmore (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 707 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/22/2020 | |
2020-06-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-06-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-11 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 22, Nays 6 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amendment tabled (Amendment 2 - SA0711) |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0709) |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-03-12 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 3 |
2020-03-12 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0594) |
2020-03-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2199 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 707