TN HB2258 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes any private right of action to collect unauthorized charges by a physician from a patient. - Amends TCA Title 29.
Title
As introduced, removes any private right of action to collect unauthorized charges by a physician from a patient. - Amends TCA Title 29.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2717 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee