TN HB2258 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "2016 Police Support Act," which allocates 50 percent of proceeds from personalization of plates and 20 percent of proceeds from sale of new specialty earmarked plates to the police pay supplement fund. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 20, Part 1; Section 9-4-204; Section 38-8-111; Title 55, Chapter 6, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "2016 Police Support Act," which allocates 50 percent of proceeds from personalization of plates and 20 percent of proceeds from sale of new specialty earmarked plates to the police pay supplement fund. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 20, Part 1; Section 9-4-204; Section 38-8-111; Title 55, Chapter 6, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/10/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2524 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2258&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB2258.pdf |