TN HB2257 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates an autism spectrum disorder task force to study and make recommendations to the general assembly regarding ways to improve access to programs and services for early screening, diagnosis, and treatment of autism spectrum disorders in this state. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, creates an autism spectrum disorder task force to study and make recommendations to the general assembly regarding ways to improve access to programs and services for early screening, diagnosis, and treatment of autism spectrum disorders in this state. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve McManus [R] | Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STUDY SUBCOMMITTEE OF FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Health Committee (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STUDY SUBCOMMITTEE OF FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Health Committee (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1010 |
2014-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-04-14 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Study Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to study subcommittee |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-03-26 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Sponsor change. |
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2014-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2014-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2538 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 1010