TN HB2251 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 53-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 682
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires that a waiver amendment to the existing TennCare II waiver that requires elective abortion providers be excluded from participation as providers in the TennCare program be submitted to the federal centers for medicare and medicaid services for approval. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires that a waiver amendment to the existing TennCare II waiver that requires elective abortion providers be excluded from participation as providers in the TennCare program be submitted to the federal centers for medicare and medicaid services for approval. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17 Pub. Ch. 682
2018-04-17 Effective date(s) 04/12/2018
2018-04-12 Signed by Governor.
2018-04-04HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2018-04-03SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-02HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-03-29HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2018-03-29SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 24, Nays 2
2018-03-29SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0808)
2018-03-29SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2018-03-15SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2018-03-13HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-03-12HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-12HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 71, Nays 17, PNV 0
2018-03-12HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0754)
2018-03-08HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2018
2018-03-07HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2018
2018-03-06HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-03-05HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-28HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/6/2018
2018-02-27HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-27HouseAction def. in Health Committee to 3/6/2018
2018-02-21HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 2/27/2018
2018-02-21HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2018-02-20HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
2018-02-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-06HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2018-02-05HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2018-02-02HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-02-01HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-01-31HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-01-31HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2148 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 682

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback