TN HB2250 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 896
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 896
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the deadline by which a distressed rural county must apply to be eligible to retain the sales and use tax generated from a commercial development district from December 31, 2016, to December 31, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, extends the deadline by which a distressed rural county must apply to be eligible to retain the sales and use tax generated from a commercial development district from December 31, 2016, to December 31, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 896 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 05/03/2018 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-27 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-22 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2228 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 896