TN HB2246 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds the chairs of the state and local government committee of the senate and the state government committee of the house of representatives to the list of officials to whom the Tennessee Wine and Grape Board must submit its annual report. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2333 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee