TN HB2246 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of education to include in the department's annual report certain information about a traineeship and fellowship program for persons wanting to work in the education of students with disabilities. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of education to include in the department's annual report certain information about a traineeship and fellowship program for persons wanting to work in the education of students with disabilities. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1779 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee