TN HB2244 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a licensed advance practice nurse or a licensed physician assistant, as long as either is working under the supervision of a licensed physician, to examine a detainee transported to a state-owned or state-operated hospital or treatment resource to determine whether the detainee is subject to admission; authorizes the nurse or physician assistant to complete a certificate of need for the emergency diagnosis, evaluation, and treatment. - Amends TCA Section 33-6-407 and Section 33-6-426.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a licensed advance practice nurse or a licensed physician assistant, as long as either is working under the supervision of a licensed physician, to examine a detainee transported to a state-owned or state-operated hospital or treatment resource to determine whether the detainee is subject to admission; authorizes the nurse or physician assistant to complete a certificate of need for the emergency diagnosis, evaluation, and treatment. - Amends TCA Section 33-6-407 and Section 33-6-426.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee to 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2175 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-26 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/11/2020