TN HB2244 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a local disaster relief fund from which sales tax refunds may be made to individuals whose residences were damaged by a disaster. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 58 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, establishes a local disaster relief fund from which sales tax refunds may be made to individuals whose residences were damaged by a disaster. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 58 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee -- Government Operations for review |
2014-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2232 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2244&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB2244.pdf |