TN HB2238 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes references to summary suspension of a license to include other licensure restriction or action within the context of a contested case hearing; expands references for disciplinary proceedings against health-related licensees to include all boards, councils, committees, agencies, or regulatory programs. - Amends TCA Section 4-5-320; Section 63-1-120 and Section 63-1-139.
Title
As enacted, changes references to summary suspension of a license to include other licensure restriction or action within the context of a contested case hearing; expands references for disciplinary proceedings against health-related licensees to include all boards, councils, committees, agencies, or regulatory programs. - Amends TCA Section 4-5-320; Section 63-1-120 and Section 63-1-139.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 594 | |
2020-03-09 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-03-05 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2169 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 594