TN HB2236 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 770
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 770
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the state board of education and the department to support and encourage LEAs in the creation of communities of schools; authorizes LEAs and schools to form community consortiums with a variety of community partners to establish communities of schools; enacts other provisions relative to community schools. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 24.
Title
As enacted, requires the state board of education and the department to support and encourage LEAs in the creation of communities of schools; authorizes LEAs and schools to form community consortiums with a variety of community partners to establish communities of schools; enacts other provisions relative to community schools. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 24.
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Johnnie Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 770 | |
2016-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/16/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2172 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 770
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2236&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB2236.pdf |