TN HB2232 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 813
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 813
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that sales and use tax on sales of water by public utility and sales of natural gas, propane, and electricity sold directly to consumer for non-residential uses only applies to charges on a customer's monthly bill for metered usage, a monthly minimum bill, a monthly customer charged, or a monthly deman charge. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that sales and use tax on sales of water by public utility and sales of natural gas, propane, and electricity sold directly to consumer for non-residential uses only applies to charges on a customer's monthly bill for metered usage, a monthly minimum bill, a monthly customer charged, or a monthly deman charge. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve McDaniel [R] | Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. David Alexander [R] |
Rep. Timothy Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 813 | |
2018-05-04 | Effective date(s) 04/27/2018 | |
2018-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-11 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-02 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2121 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 813