TN HB2231 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a company providing an extended warranty for a motor vehicle to have an extended warranty reimbursement policy; requires the company to provide a list and schedule of the required maintenance for the motor vehicle that must be followed by the warranty holder to maintain the extended warranty; creates related enforcement mechanisms and penalties. - Amends TCA Title 47; Title 55, Chapter 24 and Title 56.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 47; Title 55, Chapter 24 and Title 56, relative to motor vehicle warranties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-31HouseAssigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
2024-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
2024-01-29HouseIntro., P1C.
2024-01-26HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1582 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-30 - Refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback