TN HB2228 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1003
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1003
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides for payment of $25,000 to the estate of any correctional employee or community services employee of the state who is killed in the line of duty. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 2 and Title 41.
Title
As enacted, provides for payment of $25,000 to the estate of any correctional employee or community services employee of the state who is killed in the line of duty. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 2 and Title 41.
Sponsors
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1003 |
2014-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed Behind the Budget |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-03-18 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Action Def. in State Government Committee to 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/11/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2014-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2268 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 1003