TN HB2225 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the commissioner to commission employees of the department who have completed the required training as law enforcement officers; permits law enforcement officers within the division of parks and recreation to provide assistance outside of state parks and recreation areas. - Amends TCA Section 11-1-101; Section 11-3-107; Section 59-8-308 and Section 59-8-404.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the commissioner to commission employees of the department who have completed the required training as law enforcement officers; permits law enforcement officers within the division of parks and recreation to provide assistance outside of state parks and recreation areas. - Amends TCA Section 11-1-101; Section 11-3-107; Section 59-8-308 and Section 59-8-404.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-09 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-09 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0782) |
2020-06-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Meeeting Canceled. Reset on Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee cal. for 3/17/20 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2156 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0