TN HB2224 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits constables to post and mail detainer summonses in addition to sheriffs and deputy sheriffs. - Amends TCA Section 29-18-115.
Title
As introduced, permits constables to post and mail detainer summonses in addition to sheriffs and deputy sheriffs. - Amends TCA Section 29-18-115.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-25 | House | Action Def. in Local Government Committee to 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/19/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2014-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2432 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-06 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.