TN HB2222 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 681
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 681
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides under the Public Employee Defined Benefit Financial Security Act of 2014 that the measurement standard used to determine a pension plan's funded status must be done in accordance with rules, standards, guidelines, and interpretations established by the governmental accounting standards board; provides that for political subdivision with an existing pension plan as of May 22, 2014, the political subdivision must not establish a new pension plan until it has received written approval from the state treasurer. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 3, Part 5.
Title
As enacted, provides under the Public Employee Defined Benefit Financial Security Act of 2014 that the measurement standard used to determine a pension plan's funded status must be done in accordance with rules, standards, guidelines, and interpretations established by the governmental accounting standards board; provides that for political subdivision with an existing pension plan as of May 22, 2014, the political subdivision must not establish a new pension plan until it has received written approval from the state treasurer. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 3, Part 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 681 | |
2018-04-17 | Effective date(s) 04/12/2018 | |
2018-04-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-28 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0779) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0681) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-20 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-19 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-19 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0776) |
2018-03-19 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0869) |
2018-03-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1976 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 681