TN HB2219 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 913
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 913
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes an EFFECTs position to establish an accountability process to insure state government is efficient, forward-looking, focused, energetic, competent, and transparent. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
As enacted, establishes an EFFECTs position to establish an accountability process to insure state government is efficient, forward-looking, focused, energetic, competent, and transparent. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 913 | |
2010-05-05 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-05-04 | H. Placed on Tentative Consent Calendar for 5/05/10 | |
2010-05-04 | Reset on Tentative Consent cal. for 5/05/10 | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/26/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/29/2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 04/27/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/27/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/20/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/07/2010 | |
2009-04-08 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-03-16 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-03-04 | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-03-02 | P1C. | |
2009-02-26 | Intro. | |
2009-02-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2023 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-28 - Pub. Ch. 913
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2219&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2219.pdf |