TN HB2214 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Insurance Modernization Act." - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 2, Part 2; Title 56, Chapter 5, Part 1 and Title 56, Chapter 54.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Insurance Modernization Act." - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 2, Part 2; Title 56, Chapter 5, Part 1 and Title 56, Chapter 54.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Casualty Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Casualty Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2145 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee