TN HB2208 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 621
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 621
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, repeals requirement that aerial applicators of pesticides notify the department of agriculture prior to making aerial applications of pesticides via an online reporting system. - Amends TCA Section 43-8-302 and Section 43-8-312.
Title
As enacted, repeals requirement that aerial applicators of pesticides notify the department of agriculture prior to making aerial applications of pesticides via an online reporting system. - Amends TCA Section 43-8-302 and Section 43-8-312.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 621 | |
2020-03-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2139 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 621