TN HB2208 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Failed in Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Failed in Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows private certified firearms instructors to train teachers in certain distressed rural counties who are allowed to carry concealed firearms on school property as well as being taught by the local law enforcement agency. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-816.
Title
As introduced, allows private certified firearms instructors to train teachers in certain distressed rural counties who are allowed to carry concealed firearms on school property as well as being taught by the local law enforcement agency. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-816.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - House - CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Education Administration & Planning (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | Failed in Education Administration & Planning |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-06 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2018-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2018-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee--Education Administration & Planning |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2563 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee