TN HB2206 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1002
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1002
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires for-profit animal crematories to provide receipts to persons who bring animals for cremation at the time that the remains are left and at the time that the remains are picked up; failure to issue the receipts will be a Class E felony; exempts veterinarians from requirement. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 44; Title 62, Chapter 5; Title 68 and Title 69, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, requires for-profit animal crematories to provide receipts to persons who bring animals for cremation at the time that the remains are left and at the time that the remains are picked up; failure to issue the receipts will be a Class E felony; exempts veterinarians from requirement. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 44; Title 62, Chapter 5; Title 68 and Title 69, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Rep. John Windle [D] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Agriculture and Natural Resourc (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Agriculture and Natural Resourc (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1002 |
2014-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed Behind the Budget |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-04-01 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/25/2014 |
2014-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2014-02-10 | House | Re-ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/12/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2014-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-28 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2266 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 1002