TN HB2203 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits foreign nationals, corporations, and interest groups from interfering with state and local governmental affairs by financing certain political agendas, preferences, and activities that do not involve the election of an individual to a public office. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 19.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 19, relative to foreign influence in politics.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] |
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Johnny Garrett [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Charlie Baum [R] |
Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-14 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0568) |
2022-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2022 |
2022-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2643 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-23 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Comittee to 03/29/2022