TN HB2203 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, limits the number of state-mandated assessments by grade and subject; converts student ACT scores into letter grade equivalents for purposes of calculating certain course grades. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, limits the number of state-mandated assessments by grade and subject; converts student ACT scores into letter grade equivalents for purposes of calculating certain course grades. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. David Byrd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2589 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee