TN HB2200 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 711
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 711
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, deletes an obsolete reporting requirement for the department of human resources regarding the job performance evaluation system; revises and deletes various other reporting requirements concerning reports to legislative committees. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 38; Title 40; Title 41; Title 57; Title 64 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, deletes an obsolete reporting requirement for the department of human resources regarding the job performance evaluation system; revises and deletes various other reporting requirements concerning reports to legislative committees. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 38; Title 40; Title 41; Title 57; Title 64 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 711 | |
2020-06-02 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-05-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-03-20 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20 |
2020-03-18 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-20 |
2020-03-16 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on State Committee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1887 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 711