TN HB2195 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes issuance of National Council of Negro Women new specialty earmarked license plates; allocates 50 percent of funds produced from sale thereof to promote initiatives to maximize the personal, emotional and academic growth and development of African American children in Memphis and Shelby County. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, authorizes issuance of National Council of Negro Women new specialty earmarked license plates; allocates 50 percent of funds produced from sale thereof to promote initiatives to maximize the personal, emotional and academic growth and development of African American children in Memphis and Shelby County. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Transportation Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/14/2012 | |
2012-01-31 | Action Def. in Transportation Committee to 2/14/2012 | |
2012-01-25 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 1/31/2012 | |
2012-01-12 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-10 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-11-29 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3254 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-07 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. T&S Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2195&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB2195.pdf |