TN HB2192 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 801
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 801
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires each law enforcement agency to ensure that, whenever a person is arrested and taken into custody by an officer of the agency, the person is asked whether that person is the parent or legal custodian of any children that will be left unattended by the person's arrest; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Section 8-4-115; Title 8, Chapter 8, Part 2; Title 37, Chapter 5; Title 38, Chapter 3 and Title 40, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, requires each law enforcement agency to ensure that, whenever a person is arrested and taken into custody by an officer of the agency, the person is asked whether that person is the parent or legal custodian of any children that will be left unattended by the person's arrest; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Section 8-4-115; Title 8, Chapter 8, Part 2; Title 37, Chapter 5; Title 38, Chapter 3 and Title 40, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Rep. Jim Coley [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 801 | |
2018-04-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-12 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0793) |
2018-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1512 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 801