TN HB2183 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, deletes the statutory provision that repeals the Tennessee Zero to Three Court Initiative on January 1, 2025. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, Chapter 1, relative to the Tennessee Zero to Three Court Initiative.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-08 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 638
2024-03-18HouseComp. SB subst.
2024-03-14HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/18/2024
2024-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2024
2024-03-12HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2024-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/12/2024
2024-03-06HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2024-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/6/2024
2024-02-28HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2024-02-28HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2024-02-21HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/28/2024
2024-02-20HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2024-02-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/20/2024
2024-01-31HouseAssigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
2024-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2024-01-29HouseIntro., P1C.
2024-01-25HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1585 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Effective date(s) 04/04/2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback