TN HB2183 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts sales of gun safes from sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, exempts sales of gun safes from sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2476 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee