TN HB2180 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the distance parameter for the prohibition on a hypodermic syringe exchange program being operated within 2,000 feet of a school or park to make the parameter 1,000 feet in Nashville/Davidson County and in Chattanooga, Knoxville, and Memphis. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Title
As enacted, revises the distance parameter for the prohibition on a hypodermic syringe exchange program being operated within 2,000 feet of a school or park to make the parameter 1,000 feet in Nashville/Davidson County and in Chattanooga, Knoxville, and Memphis. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 649 | |
2018-03-29 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1977 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 649